Senate | 06/07/2024 | RECOMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/06/2024 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 9778B | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1809 | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9778A | ||
Senate | 06/03/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Senate | 05/30/2024 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |