Senate | 12/13/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.593 | ||
Senate | 12/02/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.555 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a10570 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | referred to ways and means | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/07/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1745 | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | PRINT NUMBER 9812A | ||
Senate | 06/04/2024 | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Senate | 05/31/2024 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |