Senate | 06/28/2024 | SIGNED CHAP.178 | ||
Senate | 06/26/2024 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | returned to senate | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | ordered to third reading rules cal.664 | ||
Assembly | 06/07/2024 | substituted for a3493a | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2024 | referred to education | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 06/05/2024 | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1821 | ||
Senate | 06/02/2024 | REFERRED TO RULES |