Senate | 04/02/2025 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | amended on third reading 56a | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2025 | advanced to third reading cal.11 | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2025 | referred to housing |