Assembly | 01/27/2025 | signed chap.4 | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.53 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S779 | ||
Senate | 01/14/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2025 | rules report cal.3 | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2025 | referred to governmental operations |