Assembly | 02/14/2025 | signed chap.25 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.49 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S775 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.44 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | rules report cal.44 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2025 | referred to education |