Assembly | 02/14/2025 | signed chap.47 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.152 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2669 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/27/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.32 | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | rules report cal.32 | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/14/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/09/2025 | referred to health |