Assembly | 02/14/2025 | signed chap.61 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.36 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S761 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.52 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | rules report cal.52 | ||
Assembly | 01/22/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/21/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2025 | referred to health |