Senate | 03/04/2025 | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2025 | amended on third reading 2123a | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2025 | advanced to third reading cal.18 | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/15/2025 | referred to governmental employees |