Assembly | 02/14/2025 | signed chap.68 | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.82 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S808 | ||
Senate | 02/04/2025 | REFERRED TO RULES | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/04/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.82 | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | rules report cal.82 | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 01/28/2025 | reported referred to codes | ||
Assembly | 01/16/2025 | referred to labor |