LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
A03415
Action History
NY
New York Assembly Bill A03415
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
New York 2025-2026 Regular Session
New York Assembly Bill A03415
Action History
Assembly
04/07/2025
substituted by s1030
Assembly
04/03/2025
advanced to third reading cal.92
Assembly
04/02/2025
reported
Assembly
03/25/2025
reported referred to codes
Assembly
01/27/2025
referred to election law