Senate | 02/26/2025 | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2025 | advanced to third reading cal.20 | ||
Assembly | 02/11/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2025 | print number 3681a | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2025 | amend and recommit to racing and wagering | ||
Assembly | 01/29/2025 | referred to racing and wagering |