Assembly | 03/07/2025 | signed chap.103 | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2025 | delivered to governor | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.412 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5101 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2025 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/04/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2025 | advanced to third reading cal.46 | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2025 | referred to election law |