Assembly | 05/13/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.189 | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | rules report cal.189 | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2025 | print number 6021b | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2025 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2025 | print number 6021a | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2025 | amend and recommit to people with disabilities | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2025 | referred to people with disabilities |