Assembly | 04/29/2025 | amended on third reading (t) 6769a | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2025 | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2025 | recalled from senate | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 03/24/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2025 | advanced to third reading cal.67 | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2025 | referred to local governments |