Assembly | 05/13/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.190 | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | rules report cal.190 | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 05/08/2025 | reference changed to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2025 | print number 6781b | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2025 | amend and recommit to cities | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | print number 6781a | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | amend (t) and recommit to cities | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2025 | referred to cities |