Senate | 05/05/2025 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | PASSED SENATE | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | 3RD READING CAL.729 | ||
Senate | 05/05/2025 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6665 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.143 | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | rules report cal.143 | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2025 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | referred to economic development |