Senate | 04/09/2025 | REFERRED TO CITIES 2 | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2025 | delivered to senate | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2025 | passed assembly | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | ordered to third reading rules cal.144 | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | rules report cal.144 | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | reported | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2025 | reported referred to rules | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | print number 6953a | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2025 | amend and recommit to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2025 | reported referred to ways and means | ||
Assembly | 03/18/2025 | referred to cities |