Assembly Resolution No. 161 BY: M. of A. Lupardo COMMEMORATING the 9th Annual Sock Out Cancer Day on June 1, 2025, in conjunction with the observance of National Cancer Survivors Day WHEREAS, It is the custom of this Legislative Body to recognize official days that are set aside to increase awareness of serious health issues that affect the lives of citizens of New York State; and WHEREAS, Attendant to such concern, and in full accord with its long-standing traditions, this Legislative Body is moved to commemorate the 9th Annual Sock Out Cancer Day on June 1, 2025, in conjunction with the observance of National Cancer Survivors Day, in solidarity with all New York State residents and their families fighting cancer; and WHEREAS, These endeavors during 2024 included one Sock Out Cancer benefit concert featuring Kevin Chalfant, who performed as a singer with Journey - in conjunction with the Philip Myers Band and opening act, Alyssa Crosby as seen on "The Voice" - created this special concert to be presented by Sock Out Cancer; this concert was performed on October 19, 2024 in Binghamton, NY; numerous cancer patients and their families were presented with complimentary tickets to provide for a much-needed respite from their daily routines; all net proceeds raised from the concert were distributed the evening of the event to the local hospital foundations; and WHEREAS, In furtherance of the cause, events in 2024 included Sock Out Cancer Awareness Day at the Binghamton Black Bears hockey game, March 22, 2024; Sock Out Cancer Awareness Day at the Binghamton Rumble Ponies baseball game, June 2, 2024; Birdies for Cancer at the Dick's Sporting Goods Open, June 21, 2024; and the Broome Oncology 5K Run/Walk on September 8, 2024, where the net proceeds raised were distributed to local hospital foundations and Mercy House of the Southern Tier (Community Care Shelter for Terminally Ill Patients); and WHEREAS, Security Mutual Life Insurance Company of New York and many other individuals and organizations throughout the state, and beyond, have shown their caring and commitment over the past seven years by helping to sponsor these events and raise over $1.82 million for the benefit of financially distressed cancer patients being treated in Binghamton, Syracuse, Albany, New York City, and throughout the state; and WHEREAS, In furtherance of the cause, events are being planned for 2025 in various locations throughout the state; these events will help provide financial support for Sock Out Cancer's mission to help financially distressed cancer patients throughout the state with non-medical needs such as food, housing, transportation to treatment, etc., thus enabling the patients to put additional energy into fighting cancer; and WHEREAS, These concerts and other Sock Out Cancer initiatives are designed to serve as a blueprint for individuals and health service organizations in other regions of New York State and beyond to begin instituting programs benefiting cancer patients needing assistance within their own home communities; and WHEREAS, Throughout the state, citizens help support the program and show solidarity with their friends and family members fighting cancer by purchasing and wearing Sock Out Cancer's signature multi-colored socks representing the more than 20 different types of cancer; and WHEREAS, Sock Out Cancer, LLC has entered into an agreement with Finger Lakes Textiles, a division of Mozaic, which is a member of the ARC New York, whose workforce includes individuals with varying abilities, to manufacture the Sock Out Cancer socks in Waterloo, New York; and WHEREAS, It is the sense of this Legislative Body that when organizations of such noble aims and accomplishments are brought to our attention, they should be celebrated and recognized by all the citizens of this great Empire State; now, therefore, be it RESOLVED, That this Legislative Body pause in its deliberations to commemorate the 9th Annual Sock Out Cancer Day in conjunction with National Cancer Survivors Day on June 1, 2025; and be it further RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution, suitably engrossed, be transmitted to Bruce W. Boyea, Chairman of the Board, and Kirk R. Gravely, President & CEO of Security Mutual Life Insurance Company of New York.