Senate | 04/09/2025 | Referred to committee: Financial Institutions, Insurance and Technology | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Introduced | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Reported: Finance | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Public Insurance and Pensions | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Referred to committee: Public Insurance and Pensions |