LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Ohio OH
Legislatures
2025-2026 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB6
Action History
OH
Ohio Senate Bill SB6
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Ohio 2025-2026 Regular Session
Ohio Senate Bill SB6
Action History
House
02/26/2025
Referred to committee: Development
House
02/24/2025
Introduced
Senate
02/19/2025
Passed
Senate
02/12/2025
Reported: Government Oversight and Reform
Senate
01/29/2025
Referred to committee: Government Oversight and Reform