House
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Grego
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Brewer
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Fugate, Bell, Roe
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Worthen
|
|
|