Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1029 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 29, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021