Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1065 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2021