Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1071 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021