House
|
05/27/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2022
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Vetoed 04/28/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Eric)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|