Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1096 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021