Senate | 04/13/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/17/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 33 | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Hamilton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative West (Rick) |