Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill June 7, 2021

Amended

Bill April 12, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 11, 2021