House
|
03/11/2021
|
Approved by Governor 03/11/2021
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Direct to Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by all other Representatives
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|