House
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
SA's read, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2022
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|