Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1566 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2021

Amended

Bill April 5, 2021
Bill February 19, 2021