Senate | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 11 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Amended by floor substitute | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Hilbert, Fugate, Caldwell (Trey) | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Dills | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hicks, Dossett (J.A.), Kidd | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips, Talley, Moore, Davis, Mize, Luttrell, Townley, Bashore, Sims, Dills, Pae, Fetgatter, Lawson, Blancett, McDugle, Munson, West (Tammy), Cornwell, Manger, Roberts (Eric), Wolfley, Boles, Kerbs, Dollens, Ranson, Randleman, Roe, Brewer, Cruz, Boatman, McEntire, Waldron, Conley, Rosecrants, Wallace, Virgin | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Technology | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Walke, West (Josh) |