Senate | 03/24/2022 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | Remove Representative Fetgatter as principal House author and substitute with Representative Bashore | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |