House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/22/2021 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/08/2021 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Bennett | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |