Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Steagall, Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative West (Kevin)
|
|
|