Senate | 03/16/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Humphrey | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Russ | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Frix | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bashore, Dills, Dobrinski, Davis, Fetgatter, Manger | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/18/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Stark |