Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 13 | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Newton |