House
|
04/19/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/19/2021
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Energy Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative Newton
|
|
|