Senate | 02/14/2022 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Hill | ||
House | 03/01/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson | ||
House | 02/09/2021 | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Dills |