Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) ODonnell | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Smith |