Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1768 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 3, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021