Senate | 03/30/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Technology | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |