Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1777 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 13, 2021