House | 03/04/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 67 | ||
House | 03/04/2021 | Motion to reconsider adopted | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative McBride | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 70 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/11/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative McBride | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | First Reading |