Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Amended | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McBride | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | Remove Representative McBride as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dempsey | ||
House | 02/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative McBride |