Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Motion expired
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Referred to General Government
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2021
|
Withdrawn from Public Safety Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Representative McBride
|
|
|