Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1849 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2021

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 25, 2021