Senate | 03/30/2021 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Coauthored by Bell | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Eric) | ||
House | 03/03/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/03/2021 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Dills | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 02/10/2021 | CR; Do Pass Technology Committee | ||
House | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Technology | ||
House | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Representative Williams, Hilbert |