Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1892 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/08/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
April 7, 2021 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
HOUSE BILL NO. 1892 	By: Boatman, Lawson and Bell of 
the House 
 
  and 
 
  Weaver, Bergstrom and Floyd 
of the Senate 
 
 
 
An Act relating to human traf ficking and child 
exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on 
Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child 
Exploitation; providing for membership and 
appointments; stating duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in 
Oklahoma; providing for recommendatio ns and report; 
stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; 
setting term for task force ; providing travel 
reimbursements; providing for noncodification; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
A.  There is hereby cr eated an Advisory Tas k Force on Prevention 
of Human Trafficking and Child Explo itation.  There shall be 
thirteen (13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 
1.  The Cabinet Secretary of Public Safety, or designee ;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Invest igation, 
or a designee; 
3.  The Attorney General, or a des ignee; 
4.  The Chair of the District Attorneys Council, or a designee; 
5.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and 
Dangerous Drugs Control, or a designee; 
6.  The Director of the Department of Human Services, or a 
designee; 
7.  The Executive Director of the Office of Juvenile Affairs, or 
a designee; 
8.  The Commissioner of the Department of Mental Health and 
Substance Abuse Services, or a designee; 
9.  The Commissioner of the State Depa rtment of Health, or a 
designee; 
10.  The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Association of 
Chiefs of Police, or a designee; 
11.  The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Sheriffs ’ 
Association, or a designee; 
12.  The President Pro Te mpore of the Senate, or a designee; and 
13.  The Speaker of the House of Representatives, or a designee. 
B.  The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution an d child exploitation in this state.  The 
Advisory Task Force s hall make recommendations to the Legislatu re on 
methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, 
human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in 
identifying and interrupting websites that promote p ornography and 
sexually explicit materials; and methods that develop and support 
community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse 
or prevent human trafficking, prostitution , sexual abuse or other 
factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution 
or child exploitation. 
C.  The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by 
August 1, 2021.  The Advisory Task Force shal l begin meeting and 
continue studying until January 1, 2022.  A report of the findings 
and recommendations shall be presented to the Pr esident Pro Tempore 
of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the 
Governor on or before February 1, 2022.  Upon delivery of the 
report, the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. 
D.  A majority of the members shall constitute a quorum fo r the 
purpose of conducting the business of the Advisory Task Force. 
E.  Members of the Legislature shall receive travel 
reimbursements from their respective appointing authority in 
accordance with the State Travel Reimburs ement Act. 
F.  A Senate member sh all call the initial meeting by September 
1, 2021.  The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by 
majority vote of the members.   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
G.  Staff of the Senate and House of Representatives shall 
jointly assist in staff ing the Advisory Task Force. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof t his act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
April 7, 2021 - DO PASS AS AMENDED